December 23, 2022 |
Filing
117
ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Terminate Action Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/23/2022. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
|
December 19, 2022 |
Filing
114
ORDER GRANTING 111 Defendants' Motion to Modify the Pretrial Order signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 12/19/2022. (Lawrence, A)
|
March 24, 2022 |
Filing
103
ORDER DISCARGING Order to Show Cause 98 ; ORDER VACATING 102 Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/24/2022. (Filing Deadline: 21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
|
March 23, 2022 |
Filing
102
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to file a pretrial statement ; referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/23/2022. (Objections to F&R due within 14-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
|
March 11, 2022 |
Filing
100
ORDER RESCHEDULING TELEPHONIC TRIAL CONFIRMATION HEARING BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE DALE A. DROZD as to 97 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/11/2022. ( Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 5/16/2022 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd)(Martin-Gill, S)
|
February 15, 2022 |
Filing
98
ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not be Dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/15/2022. Show Cause Response Due Within Twenty-Days. (Maldonado, C)
|
September 16, 2021 |
Filing
96
ORDER ADOPTING 84 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' 80 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/15/2021.(Martin-Gill, S)
|
May 27, 2021 |
Filing
94
ORDER discharging WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Produce Inmate Devonte B. Harris, CDCR #P-73399 88 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/27/2021. (Lundstrom, T)
|
April 27, 2021 |
Filing
88
ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Produce Inmate Devonte B. Harris, CDCR #P-73399 via Video Conference on May 27, 2021 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/26/2021. (Via Zoom)(Maldonado, C)
|
March 26, 2021 |
Filing
87
ORDER GRANTING 86 Defendants' Motion to Extend the Time to File Objections to the Pending Findings and Recommendations signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/26/2021. Objections to F&R due by 6/26/2021. (Jessen, A)
|
March 11, 2021 |
Filing
85
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/11/2021, ( Settlement Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.)(Lundstrom, T)
|
March 5, 2021 |
Filing
84
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 80 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/05/2021. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due within Thirty-Days. (Flores, E)
|
October 5, 2020 |
Filing
79
ORDER ADOPTING 78 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 72 Motion to Amend his complaint; ORDERED that this action be referred back to the assigned Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with this order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/05/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
August 14, 2020 |
Filing
78
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that the Plaintiff's 72 Motion to Amend the Complaint be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/14/2020. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within Thirty (30) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
|
August 13, 2020 |
Filing
77
ORDER Following In Camera Review, and Directing Defendants to Produce Pages 1 Through 3 of the Redacted Version of Appeal Inquiry Regarding the December 19, 2012 Incident, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/13/2020. (Rivera, O)
|
July 23, 2020 |
Filing
75
ORDER GRANTING 74 Defendants' Third Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/23/2020. Discovery deadline is extended to 10/30/2020, and the dispositive motion deadline is extended to 12/31/2020. (Rivera, O)
|
June 5, 2020 |
Filing
70
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 63 Motion to Compel, and Directing Defendants to Produce Documents for In Camera Review signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/05/2020. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
|
June 2, 2020 |
Filing
67
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 66 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/2/2020. ( Discovery deadline: 8/15/2020; Dispositive Motions deadline: 10/15/2020). (Marrujo, C)
|
April 2, 2020 |
Filing
61
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's and Defendants' 57 58 Motion to Extend the Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/01/2020. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 7/10/2020. (Flores, E)
|
January 29, 2020 |
Filing
55
INFORMATIONAL ORDER Regarding Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/29/2020. (Discovery due by 2/27/2020, Dispositive Motion filed by 4/27/2020.) (Orozco, A)
|
January 28, 2020 |
Filing
54
ORDER ADOPTING 48 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER DENYING 33 Defendants' Motion for an Order Requiring Plaintiff to Post Security as a Vexatious Litigant; and ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Action as Untimely signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/27/2020. (Jessen, A)
|
January 3, 2020 |
Filing
53
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 50 Request to Continue Deposition, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/3/20. (Gonzalez, R)
|
December 23, 2019 |
Filing
51
ORDER directing Defendants to file a Response to Plaintiff's Motion to continue Deposition 50 on or before 1/3/2020 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/23/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
|
June 27, 2019 |
Filing
48
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 33 Motion to Require Plaintiff to Post Security as a Vexatious Litigant signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/26/2019. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within Thirty (30) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
|
April 26, 2019 |
Filing
40
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 39 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/26/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
|
April 10, 2019 |
Filing
35
ORDER GRANTING 34 Defendants' Request to File Exhibit D, Attached to Request for Judicial Notice Under Seal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/9/2019. (Jessen, A)
|
January 22, 2019 |
Filing
29
ORDER Discharging Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum As to Inmate Devonte B. Harris, #P-73399, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/18/19. (Gonzalez, R)
|
December 19, 2018 |
Filing
25
ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT Inmate Devonte B. Harris, CDCR # P-73399 on January 18,2019 at 8:30 a.m. at California State Prison-Corcoran, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/18/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
October 30, 2018 |
Filing
23
ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference and STAYING Case for 120 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2018. Settlement Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 08:30 AM at CSP-Corcoran before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Sant Agata, S)
|
February 15, 2018 |
Filing
12
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 11 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/15/2018: This matter is referred back to the magistrate judge for initiation of service of process. (Hellings, J)
|
December 12, 2017 |
Filing
11
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action proceed on Plaintiff's claim against Defendants Sandor, Molina, Thomas and Bugarin for Retaliation, and against Defendants Quillen, Carranza, Alvarado, Hurtado, Perez and Magana for exce ssive force; all other claims and defendants be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief could be granted, consistent with the Court's October 19, 2017 order re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Devonte B Harris ; referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2017. Objections to F&R due by 12/29/2017(Martin-Gill, S)
|