Hisle v. Conanon, et al.
Plaintiff: Dennis Curtis Hisle
Defendant: Marlyn Conanon, Nicole Wojtal, A. Ola, C. Yang, California Correctional Health Care Services and California Department of Rehabilitation
Case Number: 1:2017cv01400
Filed: October 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING 123 Defendant Conanan's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/14/2020. Defendant Conanan's Opposition due by 11/10/2020. (Jessen, A)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendant Conanan's 107 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies be Granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/31/2020. Objections to F&R due within THIRTY DAYS. (Marrujo, C)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING 109 Motion to Amend the Complaint and directing Clerk of Court to file Second Amended Complaint Lodged 3/19/2020 108 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/13/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 102 Motion for United States Marshal to serve summons and complaint on Defendant, Mushtaq Ahmed as moot signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/22/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING Defendant, Conanan's Motion to modify the Scheduling Order 100 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/21/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ADOPTING 92 Findings and Recommendations and ORDER DENYING 68 Defendant Conanan's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/18/2019. (Jessen, A)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 94 Second Amended Complaint Lodged on November 19, 2019, for Failure to Comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/20/2019. (Orozco, A)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant Conanan's 68 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER adopting Findings and Recommendations, granting Plaintiff's Motion to amend the complaint and directing the clerk of court to file second amended complaint lodged on May 22, 2019 60 , 67 , 72 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/16/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING 65 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/19/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline contrued as a Motion to Amend the Complaint 60 be Granted; the Clerk of the Court be DIRECTED to File the Second Amended Complaint, lodged on Ma y 22, 2019 67 re 60 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to Extend Discovery Schedual Period to Conclude filed by Dennis Curtis Hisle ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/18/19. Objections to F&R due 14 - Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting in Part, Plaintiff's 59 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum, and Denying, without Prejudice, Plaintiff's Third Motion for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/26/2019. (Flores, E)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 57 Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's Recusal Order signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/20/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 52 Motion for Recusal of Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/26/2019. (Flores, E)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING 51 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/7/2019. Discovery due by 4/23/2019. (Jessen, A)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Amend the Complaint and Addressing Plaintiff's Objections to the Court's November 14, 2018 Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/10/2019.(Sant Agata, S)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 38 Motion for Subpoenas signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/18. (Marrujo, C)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and Denying Plaintiff's 27 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/18/2018. (Flores, E)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING 28 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/14/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint to Add CEO Young as a Defendant be DENIED re 7 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/31/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, Plaintiff's Second Motion for Appointment of Counsel 23 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/21/2018. (Hellings, J)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING Settlement Conference set for August 14, 2018, and Amended Discovery and Scheduling Order 19 20 and 21 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/24/18.(All Discovery: 1/13/2019, Dispositive Motions filed by 3/17/2019, Amending Pleadings Deadline: 11/12/2018, Motions filed by 8/13/2018) (ORDER LIFTING STAY) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and STAYING Case for 120 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/23/2018: Settlement Conference set for 8/14/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Hellings, J)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting Findings and Recommendations, allowing action to proceed on Plaintiff's claim of deliberate indifference against Defendants, Marlyn Conanon and John Doe (at Mercy Hospital) and dismissing all other Defendants re 7 , 11 , 12 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/4/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's Deliberate Indifference Claim Proceed Against Defendants Conanon and John Doe at Mercy Hospital signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/28/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 12/26/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING, Without Prejudice, Plaintiff's 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/27/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hisle v. Conanon, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Curtis Hisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlyn Conanon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Wojtal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Ola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?