N.M. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: N. M.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv01423
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/30/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to File and Serve Certified Administrative Record and Modify Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/15/2018. Pursuant to the above stipulation (Doc. 11 ) Defendant shall file a copy of the Certified Administrative Record no later than April 13, 2018. All dates in this Court's scheduling order issued on October 26, 2017, are modified accordingly. (Doc. 6 ). (Valdez, E)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Appoint Nely Rodriguez as Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem 3 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/27/17. (Hellings, J)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/25/17. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.M. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. M.
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?