McCallum et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: David McCallum and Donna McCallum
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01481
Filed: November 3, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Close This Action signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/24/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
January 16, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 11 Order to Show Cause; Deadline: January 26, 2018 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/16/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 10, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING Defendant to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions should not Issue for Failure to Comply with December 7, 2017 Order; Show Cause Response due within Five (5) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/9/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
December 7, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIVE DOCUMENTS AND VACATING ALL PENDING DATES AND MATTERS. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: All pending matters and dates in this action are VACATED; and The parties shall file dispositional documents within thirty days of the date of service of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/7/2017. (Hernandez, M)
December 5, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 4 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss set for hearing on December 13, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/5/2017. (Hernandez, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCallum et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David McCallum
Represented By: Marc Steven Applbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna McCallum
Represented By: Marc Steven Applbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Leigh Otsuka Curran
Represented By: D. Dennis La
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?