Arzamendi v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Delores Arzamendi
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01485
Filed: November 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER VACATING Hearing, Granting 50 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/21/19. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER GRANTING Relief from Final Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/15/2018. Case reopened. (Sant Agata, S)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/24/18. (Marrujo, C)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DECISION AND ORDER DISMISSING AND CLOSING CASE, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/3/18. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING 26 Motion to Dismiss ; First Amended Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/29/18. (Amended Complaint due: 30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER on JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, 23 . The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended complaint is hereby extended to April 25, 2018. No other deadlines shall be affected by this Order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/18/2018. (Timken, A)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Granting Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/8/18. Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arzamendi v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Arzamendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Tara Mohseni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?