Mendez v. Bank of America, N.A.,

Plaintiff: Lori A. Mendez
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01509
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal 30 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/21/2018: The Clerk of the Court is HEREBY ORDERED to CLOSE the file in this case and adjust the docket to reflect voluntary dismissal of this action pursuant to Rule 41(a). It is FURTHER ORDERED that all pending matters and dates shall be VACATED. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
March 19, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MARCH 21, 2018 HEARING. Accordingly, the parties shall be prepared to address at the March 21, 2018 hearing whether Plaintiffs conduct in filing this action would be considered reasonable and good faith in applying Californias equitable tolling doctrine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/19/2018. (Hernandez, M)
March 1, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA MOTION TO DISMISS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendant shall file a reply which includes legal analysis on whether American Pipe tolling would be applied under California law to the claims in this action on or before March 9, 2018; Plaintiff may file a surreply limited to whether American Pipe tolling would be applied under California law to the claims in this action on or before March 14, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/1/2018. (Hernandez, M)
January 25, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT on or before February 9, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/25/2018. (Hernandez, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. Bank of America, N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori A. Mendez
Represented By: Sin-Ting Mary Liu
Represented By: Caitlyn C. Prichard, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?