Weldon v. Kapetan et al

Plaintiff: Paul Weldon
Defendant: Jonathan Nicholas Kapetan and Fresno Superior Court
Case Number: 1:2017cv01536
Filed: November 17, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 20 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/13/18. (Gonzalez, R)
June 11, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Finding Appeal Not Taken in Good Faith re 18 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/11/2018. cc: Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (Jessen, A)
May 22, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 12 13 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/21/2018. (Flores, E)
May 9, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS in Part, and Dismissing Entire Complaint without Leave to Amend signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/09/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
April 10, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in part, Declining to Adopt in Part, and Providing Plaintiff an Opportunity to Respond RE Dismissal without Leave to Amend signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/09/2018. Show Cause Response due by 5/4/2018. (Flores, E)
February 20, 2018 4 Opinion or Order of the Court Findings and Recommendations that Plaintiff's claims be denied with prejudice in part and without prejudice in part, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/20/2018. Matter referred to Judge O' Neill. Objections to F&R due by 3/16/2018. (Rosales, O)
November 21, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/21/2017. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weldon v. Kapetan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Nicholas Kapetan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?