Peterson v. Lizarraga

Petitioner: Richard Peterson
Respondent: Joe Lizarraga
Case Number: 1:2017cv01537
Filed: August 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS That the Court Deny Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS That the Court Dismiss the Motion for Summary Judgment as Moot 14 , 77 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/20/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Discharging Respondent From Filing Status Reports 56 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/24/2018. (Hellings, J)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION that the Court Deny Petitioner's Motions for Sanctions, Motion for Summary Judgment, and Request for Emergency Action 43 , 44 , 52 , 53 , 64 , 68 , 71 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/27/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Directing Respondent to File Status Reports Regarding the 2012 Trial Transcript, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/7/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's 38 40 Motion for Sanctions as Premature; ORDER DIRECTING Respondent to File Status Report signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/27/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 32 Motion for State Court Records as Premature signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 02/12/2018. (Flores, E)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause; ORDER Granting 30 Day Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 01/08/2018. (Flores, E)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Respondent should not be sanctioned for failure to respond to petition signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/4/2018. Show Cause Response due within 15-Days.(Lundstrom, T)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's 20 Motion to Strike ;ORDER STRIKING Petitioner's Notice of Failure to Respond by the California Attorney General 19 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/12/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:17-cv-1693 GGH HC) to Fresno (1:17-cv-1537 SKO HC) signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/16/2017. (Yin, K)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/15/2017 DENYING 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice to a renewal of the motion at a later stage of the proceedings. (Washington, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joe Lizarraga
Represented By: Heather M. Heckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?