Barajas v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Dalila Barajas
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2017cv01551
Filed: November 20, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Amended Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/9/2018. Pursuant to the parties' amended stipulation, and for cause shown, it is hereby ordered that Defenda nt is granted an extension of time to December 28, 2018, to serve and file a response to Plaintiff's Opening Brief. All other deadlines in the Court's Scheduling Order are modified accordingly. However, the parties are cautioned that further extensions of time will not be granted in this action absent a demonstrated showing of good cause. (Valdez, E)
October 1, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/28/2018. Show Cause Response due by 10/5/2018.(Lundstrom, T)
August 15, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule and Granting Plaintiff's Request for a Further 14-Day Extension to File Opening Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/15/2018. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, an d for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted a further extension of fourteen (14) days to serve and file her Opening Brief. Plaintiff's Opening Brief shall be filed on or before September 4, 2018. All other deadlines set forth in the Courts Scheduling Order are modified accordingly. (Valdez, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barajas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalila Barajas
Represented By: Melissa Newel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?