Cortes v. J.P.Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Martin J. Cortes
Defendant: J.P.Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01562
Filed: November 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Referring Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE DISMISSAL signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/27/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING defendant's request to appear telephonically at the scheduling conference set for 4/12/2018 before Magistrate Judge Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/122/2018. (Rooney, M)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/7/2018. (Kusamura, W)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Scheduling ORDER Re: Pending Motion to Dismiss 5 ,signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/13/2018. (Case Management Deadline: 2/23/2018) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File a Change of Address; ORDER Directing Clerk to Mail Docket Entries to Plaintiff; ORDER Directing Defendant to Re-Serve Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/26/2017. (Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortes v. J.P.Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P.Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Bryant S. Delgadillo
Represented By: David M. Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?