Jesse Youngblood v. Overley

Plaintiff: Jesse L Youngblood
Defendant: D. Overley
Case Number: 1:2017cv01598
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE and ORDER Finding that Plaintiff is Not Entitled to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on the Appeal Filed April 20, 2018 re 19 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Serve Copy of Order on Ninth Circuit, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/9/18. (Gonzalez, R)
April 3, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING Action without Prejudice for Failure to Pay Filing Fee; ORDER Directing Clerk to Terminate all Pending Motions and Close Case signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/03/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
March 16, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/16/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 2, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Denying 2 8 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/01/2018. Twenty-One Day Deadline.(Flores, E)
December 6, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 2 be DENIED, pursuant to 28:1915(g); Plaintiff be ordered to pay the $400.00 initial filing fee in full to proceed with this action re 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Jesse L Youngblood ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/5/17. Objections to F&R due by 12/26/2017 (Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesse Youngblood v. Overley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse L Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Overley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?