Kemper Independence Insurance Co. v. Wells, et al.

Plaintiff: Kemper Independence Insurance Company
Defendant: Blake Wells, Ronald W. Wells, Jr., Cheryl Wells and Jenny Doe
Case Number: 1:2017cv01612
Filed: December 5, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Clerk of Court to close case and adjust docket to reflect Voluntary Dismissal 13 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/30/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
February 21, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH JANUARY 25, 2018 ORDER OR SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT ISSUE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within twenty-four (24) hours from the date of entry of this order, Plaintiff shall file a redacted copy of Exhibit A or show cause in writing why sanctions should not issue for the failure to comply with the January 25, 2018 order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/21/2018. (Hernandez, M)
February 2, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file dispositional documents and vacating pending matters and dates 9 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/2/2018. ( Filing Deadline: 4/2/2018.)(Lundstrom, T)
January 25, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Addressing Request to Redact and ORDER STAYING ACTION signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/24/2018. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal ECF 5 . Plaintiff is directed to file a redacted copy of Exhibit A within five (5) days. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemper Independence Insurance Co. v. Wells, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald W. Wells, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kemper Independence Insurance Company
Represented By: Maria Louise Cousineau
Represented By: Dina Rebecca Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?