HOA Systems, LLC et al v. Parco Holdings, LP et al

Plaintiff: HOA Systems, LLC and HI Limited Partnership
Defendant: Parco Holdings, LP, Robert A. Pardini and John A. Pardini
Case Number: 1:2017cv01664
Filed: December 11, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 20 ORDER APPROVING Joint Stipulation to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/17/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 17 Order GRANTING joint stipulation extending time for Defendants' to respond to complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/10/2018. (Response to complaint due by 4/30/2018; Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 4/30/2018 has been CONTINUED to 5/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean ) (Rosales, O)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 15 Order GRANTING joint stipulation extending time for Defendants to respond to complaint and requesting the continuation of the mandatory scheduling conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/26/2018. (Answer to Complaint filed by 3/14/2018; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/30/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean ) (Rosales, O)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER GRANTING the parties' stipulation, document 12 , that defendants John A. Pardini, Robert A. Pardini, and Parco Holdings, LP have through and including Thursday, February 22, 2018, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/24/2018. (Rooney, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOA Systems, LLC et al v. Parco Holdings, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOA Systems, LLC
Represented By: Luanne Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HI Limited Partnership
Represented By: Luanne Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parco Holdings, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Pardini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Pardini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?