Sotomayor-Rodriguez v. On Habeas Corpus
Petitioner: Emilio Sotomayor-Rodriguez
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Case Number: 1:2017cv01721
Filed: December 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Respondent's Motion to Dismiss 6 ; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge - CASE ASSIGNED to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. New Case No. 1:18-cv-01721 LJO JDP (HC), signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/11/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting briefing schedule for Respondent's re 6 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 6/5/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Petition should not be Granted; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Serve Documents on Respondent; Show Cause Response due within Forty-Five (45) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/28/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER dismissing Petition with leave to file a First Amended Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/30/2018. First Amended Petition due within 30-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sotomayor-Rodriguez v. On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Emilio Sotomayor-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?