Hargrove v. City of Bakersfield et al
Plaintiff: Tatyana Hargrove
Defendant: City of Bakersfield, Christopher Moore and G. Vasquez
Case Number: 1:2017cv01743
Filed: December 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION and ORDER 103 for Waiver of Fees and Costs in Exchange for Waiver of Right to Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/26/2019. (Hall, S)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE 49 51 52 53 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/7/2019. (Hall, S)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING 63 Plaintiff's Request to Seal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/1/2019. (Hall, S)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER 55 re Defendants' Motions in Limine Nos. 1, 5, 8, 10, 12, 13, 14, 17 and 19, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/25/2019. (Hall, S)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/16/2019. (Hall, S)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER 38 to Vacate Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/19/2019. The Settlement Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto is VACATED. (Hall, S)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/5/2019. (Kusamura, W) (Main Document 36 replaced on 6/5/2019) (Kusamura, W).
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER AFTER INFORMAL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/26/2019. (Hall, S)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING 31 Stipulation to Modify the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/7/2019. (Hall, S)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER AFTER IN CAMERA REVIEW of Records of Taco Bell, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/21/2018. (Hall, S)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER AFTER IN CAMERA REVIEW of Records of the Kern County Superintendent of Schools, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/11/2018. (Hall, S)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED ORDER AFTER IN CAMERA REVIEW of Records of Vista West High School, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/2/2018. (Hall, S)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER AFTER IN CAMERA REVIEW of Records of Alia Corp. (McDonald's), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/1/2018. (Hall, S)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER AFTER IN CAMERA REVIEW of Records of the Kern High School District/Vista West High School, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/30/2018. (Hall, S)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/2/2018. (Hall, S)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/23/2018. Pleading Amendment Deadline 9/24/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 4/18/2018; Non-Expert 2/19/2019; Expert 4/15/2019. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 4/30/2019; Hearing by 5/28/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/10/2019; Hearing by 7/22 /2019. Settlement Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 10/7/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for all future filings signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/7/2018. New case number: 1:17-cv-01743-JLT.(Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hargrove v. City of Bakersfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bakersfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatyana Hargrove
Represented By: Neil K. Gehlawat
Represented By: Thomas Carter Seabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?