Stewart v. Christianson et al

Plaintiff: Gerald Stewart
Defendant: Adam Christianson, California Forensic Medical Group and Correctional Medical Group
Case Number: 1:2018cv00058
Filed: December 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Prosecute, and Failure to Comply with Court Orders, Objections if any, Due Within 14 Days; ORDER to Assign District Judge, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Pete rson on 11/23/18. This Case is Assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The New Case No. is: 1:18-cv-0058-DAD-JDP. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Gonzalez, R)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 13 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/01/2018. (Flores, E)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Plaintiff to Submit Trust Statement,signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/22/18. (Case Management Deadline: 30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:17-cv-2688 CMK PC) to Fresno (1:18-cv-0058 MJS PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/12/2018. (Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Christianson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?