Gann v. Kokor et al
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Marcus Gann
Defendant: W. Kokor, J. Enenmoh, C. Cryer and J. Lewis
Case Number: 1:2018cv00084
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 39 Motion to File Second Amended Complaint and to Change Case Caption and ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to File Lodged Second Amended Complaint and Recaption Case signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/17/2021. (Jessen, A)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RESETTING Deadline for Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint with Information Identifying Defendants Doe 1, Doe 2, and Doe 3; Thirty (30) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/9/2021. (Sant Agata, S)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING In Part Plaintiff's 34 Motion to Compel Compliance With Subpoena Duces Tecum, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/15/2021. Warden's Response Due: Forty-Five (45) Days. (Copy of this order placed in USM box.) (Marrujo, C)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 25 Findings and Recommendations Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants; ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Submit Information Identifying Defendants Doe 1, Doe 2, and Doe 3, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/1/2020. Notice due within ninety (90) days. (Rivera, O)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to dismiss certain claims and defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/15/2019. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; ORDER ADOPTING 18 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS;The matter is referred back to the assigned Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with this order, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 06/22/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 12 , be DENIED re 12 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Nathaniel Marcus Gann ; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/11/18. Objections to F&R due by 5/29/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 6 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand be DENIED re 2 Notice of Removal signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/16/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Objection to Removal of Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/26/18. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gann v. Kokor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Marcus Gann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Kokor
Represented By: Lucas L. Hennes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Enenmoh
Represented By: Lucas L. Hennes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Cryer
Represented By: Lucas L. Hennes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Represented By: Lucas L. Hennes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?