Jaquish v. The Standard Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Yvette L Jaquish
Defendant: The Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00087
Filed: January 18, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close the Case 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/30/2018. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
March 13, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER FOR THIRD EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PENDING SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the complaint is hereby extended from March 13, 2018, to April 12, 2018. This extension doe s not alter any other deadlines. The Scheduling Conference in this matter is currently set for April 19, 2018, at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 7. The parties shall file their Joint Scheduling Report by no later than April 12, 2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/13/2018. (Timken, A)
March 1, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the complaint is hereby extended from February 27, 2018, through March 13, 2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/1/2018. (Timken, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaquish v. The Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette L Jaquish
Represented By: Allan M. Bailey
Represented By: Robert Krase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Jordan Shae Altura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?