Rhoden v. Department of State Hospitals et al
Plaintiff: Lawtis Donald Rhoden
Defendant: Department of State Hospitals, Pam Ahlin and Brandon Price
Case Number: 1:2018cv00101
Filed: January 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, without prejudice, to re-filing with proper Rand Notice 63 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/8/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING 61 Defendants' Motion to Extend the Time to File a Dispositive Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/26/2019. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/7/2019. (Jessen, A)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Second 59 Motion to Supplement the Complaint with Legal Authority, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/30/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 57 Motion to Supplement the Complaint with Legal Authority, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/23/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ADOPTING 51 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed on March 7, 2019, is denied, without prejudice, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/25/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER extending the Amended Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendant, Stephen Eggen signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/13/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION recommending Plaintiff's MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 50 be denied, without prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/11/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 AMENDED Discovery and Scheduling ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/4/19. New Discovery Deadline: June 27, 2019; New Dispositive Motion Deadline: August 27, 2019. (Marrujo, C)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 40 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/23/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER adopting 30 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing access to the courts and medical claims and referring matter back to the Magistrate Judge for initiation of service of process signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/15/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending dismissal of certian claims for failure to state a cognizable claim for relief re 29 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/30/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 21-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Adopting 22 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; DENYING Plaintiff's Motions for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/8/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 8 , 11 , 15 , 19 Motions to Amend and DIRECTING Clerk of the Court to File Third Amended Complaint Lodged on February 8, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/13/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhoden v. Department of State Hospitals et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawtis Donald Rhoden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Ahlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?