March 18, 2022 |
Filing
176
ORDER on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and the Parties' Respective Motions to Exclude (In re Doc. Nos. 142 , 144 , 145 , 147 , 148 , 153 , 157 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/17/2022. CASE CLOSED. (Rivera, O)
|
October 6, 2021 |
Filing
146
ORDER denying, without prejudice, stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of plaintiffs Anthony Perez and Cecilia Perez from certain claims (ECF No. 139 ). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/6/2021. (Rooney, M)
|
August 31, 2021 |
Filing
132
Order GRANTING stipulated request for depositions of experts after cutoff, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/31/2021. (Rosales, O.)
|
May 7, 2021 |
Filing
129
Order GRANTING stipulated request to modify schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/7/2021. (Expert Disclosure due by 7/2/2021; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 7/16/2021 ; Expert Discovery due by 9/6/2021; Dispositive Mo tions filed by 10/6/2021; Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 5/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Rosales, O.)
|
April 22, 2021 |
Filing
127
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/22/2021. (Apodaca, P)
|
February 26, 2021 |
Filing
125
ORDER RE: STIPULATION RE: BODYWORN CAMERA FOOTAGE signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/26/2021. IT IS SO ORDERED the confidentiality designation attached to the redacted version of the body worn camera footage is lifted as of Friday, March 5, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Nothing in this Order prohibits any attorney or party in this case from making any public comment that references American Ambulance or its employees. (Gonzales, V)
|
February 11, 2021 |
Filing
123
ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/11/2021. (Gonzales, V)
|
January 29, 2021 |
Filing
122
ORDER GRANTING stipulation to modify case management schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/28/2021. Non-Expert Discovery due 5/21/2021; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 6/11/2021; Rebuttal Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 6/25/2021; Expert Discovery due by 8/16/2021; Dispositive Motions filed by 9/15/2021; Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; and trial date of 5/10/2022 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii remains as previously set. (Rooney, M)
|
January 25, 2021 |
Filing
120
Order GRANTING 118 Motion to Correct or Modify Case Management Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/25/2021. (Jury Trial currently set for 3/15/2022 has been CONTINUED TO 5/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Rosales, O.)
|
November 12, 2020 |
Filing
116
Order re modification of case management schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/12/2020. (Non-Expert Discovery due by 4/16/2021; Expert Disclosures due by 5/7/2021; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 5/21/2021; Expert Discove ry due by 7/12/2021; Dispositive Motions filed by 8/11/2021; Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 3/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii)(Rosales, O.)
|
October 2, 2020 |
Filing
90
ORDER GRANTING the Parties' 89 Stipulation, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/2/2020. Plaintiff "X.P., a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, MICHELLE PEREZ, individually and as Successor in Interest to Joseph Perez" shall be replaced with "Xavier Perez, individually and as Successor in Interest to Joseph Perez". (Rivera, O)
|
September 11, 2020 |
Filing
86
Order re release of video and modifying August 27, 2020 order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/11/2020. (Rosales, O.)
|
August 27, 2020 |
Filing
83
Order concerning dispute as to whether body camera footage produced by city Defendants should remain confidential pursuant to stipulated protective order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/26/2020. (Rosales, O.)
|
July 31, 2020 |
Filing
80
Order GRANTING stipulation and joint request for trial continuance and modification of case management schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/30/2020. (Non Expert Discovery due by 2/19/2021; Initial Expert Disclosure due by 3/12/2021; Rebuttal Supplemental Expert Disclosure due by 3/26/2021; Expert Discovery due by 5/17/2021; Dispositive Motions filed by 6/16/2021; Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 12/7/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Rosales, O.)
|
January 23, 2020 |
Filing
73
ORDER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE, WITHOUT CHANGE TO TRIAL DATE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, without change to the 4/20/2021 trial date, the Court's Case Management Schedule [Doc. 66 ] is hereby modified and reset as follows: Non-Expert D iscovery Cut-off due by 9/25/2020, Initial Expert Disclosures due by 10/16/2020, Rebuttal/Supplemental Expert Disclosures due by 10/30/2020, Expert Discovery Cut-off due by 12/18/2020, Dispositive Motions/MSJ filed by 1/13/2021, Dispositive Motions/ MSJ Hearing Deadline 2/10/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, with the trial date to remain as previously set. Status Conference currently set for 1/27/2020 is CONTINUED to 5/4/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/22/2020. (Apodaca, P.)
|
April 24, 2019 |
Filing
55
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES. IT IS ORDERED as follows: Plaintiffs are granted leave to file the First Amended Complaint submitted concurrently with the stipulation as the operative complaint withi n the meaning of Rule 15(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The current scheduling order (ECF Nos. 29 & 49 ) is hereby vacated. The parties shall submit a proposed new scheduling order to the Court within one week of an appearance by the newly-named Defendants. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/24/2019. (Apodaca, P)
|
November 15, 2018 |
Filing
49
ORDER on stipulation modifying case management schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/14/18. (Marrujo, C)
|
May 25, 2018 |
Filing
31
PROTECTIVE ORDER Re Confidential Documents 30 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/25/2018. (Hellings, J)
|
March 1, 2018 |
Filing
22
ORDER RE Joint Stipulation of the Parties for Dismissal with Prejudice of Plaintiff's Anthony Perez and Cecilia Perez from the First Federal Claim for Excessive Force and from all State Claims signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 03/01/2018. (Flores, E)
|
January 29, 2018 |
Filing
7
ORDER GRANTING Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/26/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
|