United States of America v. Schmidt

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Arnold H. Schmidt
Case Number: 1:2018cv00196
Filed: February 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING 9 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Enforcing Internal Revenue Summons signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/19/2018. (Flores, E)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that the 1 Petition to Enforce I.R.S. Summons be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/16/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 5/4/2018.(Flores, E)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order to Show Cause re: tax summons enforcement, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/12/2018. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/6/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Rosales, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Kelli L. Taylor, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arnold H. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?