Ruby v. Matevovsian

Plaintiff: Steve Ruby
Defendant: A. Matevovsian
Case Number: 1:2018cv00200
Filed: February 8, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING Service by the United States Marshal without Prepayment of Costs (Bivens), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/2/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 2, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING September 28, 2018 16 Order Directing Service by the United States Marshal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/2/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 15, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for leave to amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/15/2018. Amended Complaint due by 7/19/2018. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruby v. Matevovsian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Matevovsian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?