Kasey F. Hoffman v. Pulido et al

Plaintiff: Kasey F. Hoffman
Defendant: L. Pulido and C. Smith
Case Number: 1:2018cv00209
Filed: February 9, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Objections 14 , 15 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/8/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
March 22, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's Reply to Order to Show Cause 12 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/22/2018: This case remains CLOSED. (Hellings, J)
March 15, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING Matter Following Order to Show Cause 7 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/15/2018. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
February 15, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why In Forma Pauperis Status Should Not Be Denied 1 , 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/15/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kasey F. Hoffman v. Pulido et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasey F. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Pulido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?