Spaulding v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: N.D.J.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv00325
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re STIPULATION TO REMAND Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/25/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
September 26, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/25/18. (Marrujo, C)
March 9, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Lacole Spaulding's 3 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/8/18. (Gonzalez, R)
March 8, 2018 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/8/18. (Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spaulding v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.D.J.
Represented By: Roger David Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Margaret Branick-Abilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?