Sequoia ForestKeeper et al v. Carlson et al

Plaintiff: Sequoia ForestKeeper and Earth Island Institute
Defendant: Ann Carlson and U.S. Forest Service
Case Number: 1:2018cv00331
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STAYING BRIEFING ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL IN RELATED CASE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 25, 2018. (Munoz, I)
July 16, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER GRANTING 20 Motion to Intervene signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/16/2018. (Jessen, A)
June 19, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR DISPENSING WITH STATEMENTS OF UNDISPUTED FACTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/19/2018. (Hernandez, M)
June 18, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Pro Hac Vice Application, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/15/18. (Gonzalez, R)
April 24, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to reassign case to Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/23/2017. The new case number is 1:18-cv-00331-LJO-SAB. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sequoia ForestKeeper et al v. Carlson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sequoia ForestKeeper
Represented By: Matt Kenna, PHV
Represented By: Rene Peter Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earth Island Institute
Represented By: Matt Kenna, PHV
Represented By: Rene Peter Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Carlson
Represented By: Joseph Frueh(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: Joseph Frueh(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?