Laury v. Motl, et al.

Plaintiff: Daniel Allen Laury
Defendant: Wayne Motl, Steven Stalie and S. Sherman
Case Number: 1:2018cv00333
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action (new case number is 1:18-cv-00333-AWI-BAM); FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Action for Failure to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/16/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 30, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 10 Order to Show Cause why this action should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute; Plaintiff's complaint will be screened in due course, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/30/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 5, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Change of Address or SHOW CAUSE Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute; ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Re-Serve March 23, 2018 Order on Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/4/2018. Change of Address or Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laury v. Motl, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Allen Laury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Motl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Stalie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?