VTail, LLC v. Golden Corral Inc. et al
Plaintiff: VTail, LLC
Defendant: Darryl Webb, Golden Corral, Inc. and Telly Smith
Case Number: 1:2018cv00339
Filed: March 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CLOSING THE ACTION signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/15/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 15, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice by VTail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Servie - Stipulation and Order)(Wansor, Jason)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER AFTER #17 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/21/2018. Stipulated dismissal due by 6/15/2018. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
May 17, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT in Principle and Motion to Vacate All Deadlines by VTail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service - Notice of Settlement in Principle and Motion to Vacate All Deadlines)(Wansor, Jason)
May 14, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Golden Corral, Inc., Telly Smith, Darryl Webb. Attorney Bautista, Leo A. added.(Bautista, Leo)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to Attorney David J. Tappeiner to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for His Failure to Obtain Membership in this Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/2/2018. Show Cause Response due by 5/9/2018. (Hall, S)
May 2, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order to Show Cause served on David J. Tappeiner NCAED. (Hall, S)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER #13 for Extension of Time for Defendants Golden Corral Corporation, Darryl Webb and Telly Smith to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/1/2018. (Hall, S)
May 1, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Stipulation and Order served on David J. Tappeiner NCAED. (Hall, S)
April 30, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by Golden Corral, Inc., Telly Smith, Darryl Webb. (Ward, Garth)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants Darryl Webb, Golden Corral, Inc., and Telly Smith to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/5/2018. Responsive pleading due by 4/30/2018. (Hall, S)
April 5, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Golden Corral, Inc., Telly Smith, Darryl Webb. Attorney Ward, Garth N. added. (Ward, Garth)
April 5, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order served on David J. Tappeiner NCAED. (Hall, S)
March 27, 2018 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Golden Corral, Inc., Telly Smith, Darryl Webb by VTail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service - First Amended Complaint)(Wansor, Jason)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER #8 re Filing of First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/22/2018. First Amended Complaint to be filed within three court days. (Hall, S)
March 22, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Stipulation and Order served on David J. Tappeiner NCAED. (Hall, S)
March 21, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Filing of First Amended Complaint by VTail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Wansor, Jason)
March 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by VTail, LLC. Attorney Wansor, Jason William added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Wansor, Jason)
March 16, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Golden Corral, Inc., Telly Smith, Darryl Webb. Attorney Slome, Ernest added. (Slome, Ernest)
March 13, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Golden Corral, Inc. re Service by Mail. (Bautista, Leo)
March 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of NONCOMPLIANCE With Electronic Filing Requirement (Local Rule 135(g)): Attorney David J. Tappeiner, NCAED is directed to register for CM/ECF. (Sant Agata, S)
March 9, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
March 9, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Notice of Noncompliance with Electronic Filing Requirement, #3 Civil New Case Documents for DAD, served on David J. Tappeiner NCAED. (Sant Agata, S)
March 8, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-18-100244 by GOLDEN CORRAL, INC.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7544256) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bautista, Leo)
March 8, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by GOLDEN CORRAL, INC. (Bautista, Leo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VTail, LLC v. Golden Corral Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Webb
Represented By: Ernest Slome
Represented By: Garth N. Ward
Represented By: Leo A. Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Corral, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Alden Fox
Represented By: Deborah F Sirias
Represented By: Leo A. Bautista
Represented By: Ernest Slome
Represented By: Garth N. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telly Smith
Represented By: Garth N. Ward
Represented By: Leo A. Bautista
Represented By: Ernest Slome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VTail, LLC
Represented By: David J. Tappeiner, NCAED
Represented By: David J. Tappeiner
Represented By: George Michael Brelje, Jr.
Represented By: Jason William Wansor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?