Moseley et al v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Gene Moseley and Michelle Moseley
Defendant: Michael Johnson, Christman Kelley & Clarke, PC, Dugan P. Kelley and Matthew M. Clarke
Case Number: 1:2018cv00344
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2018 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/28/2018. (Defendants are hereby directed to show cause within fourteen (14) days of service of this order a s to why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Defendants may discharge this order to show cause by providing sufficient information indicating the full citizenship of each of the defendants and establishing that the parties are in fact truly diverse. See generally, The Wagstaffe Group Practice Guide: Federal Civil Procedure Before Trial, §7III (2017).) (Thorp, J)
April 3, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 6 Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/3/2018. (Hall, S)
March 13, 2018 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING and REASSIGNING Case, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/13/18. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moseley et al v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christman Kelley & Clarke, PC
Represented By: Arnold John Anchordoquy
Represented By: Stephen T Clifford
Represented By: Dennis Patrick Gallagher, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dugan P. Kelley
Represented By: Arnold John Anchordoquy
Represented By: Stephen T Clifford
Represented By: Dennis Patrick Gallagher, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew M. Clarke
Represented By: Arnold John Anchordoquy
Represented By: Stephen T Clifford
Represented By: Dennis Patrick Gallagher, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?