Jones v. The People of the State of California

Petitioner: Alvin Bernard Jones
Respondent: J. Gastelo
Case Number: 1:2018cv00493
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART Respondent's Motion for Extension, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 06/25/18. (Response due: 07/26/18)(Martin-Gill, S)
April 27, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion to Amend the Name a Proper Respondent; ORDER Substituting J. Gastelo as Respondent in this matter, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 04/26/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 12, 2018 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Petitioner Leave to File Motion to Amend to Name a Proper Respondent signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/12/2018. 30-day deadline. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. The People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alvin Bernard Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Gastelo
Represented By: Fon Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?