Munoz Ferrer v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Ismael Munoz Ferrer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv00494
Filed: April 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause 18 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/14/2019. (Jessen, A)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE for Plaintiff's failure to file opening brief signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/20/2019. Show Cause Response due within 20-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re Stipulated Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/25/2019. (Valdez, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz Ferrer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Munoz Ferrer
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Margaret Branick-Abilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?