July 28, 2023 |
Filing
259
ORDER Granting Stipulated Entry of Default and Dismissal of Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/27/2023.(Flores, E)
|
April 4, 2023 |
Filing
241
AMENDED Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(A)(1)(A)(II) of Defendant Custom AG Formulators, Inc., signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/4/2023. (Marrujo, C)
|
April 3, 2023 |
Filing
240
ORDER Dismissing Custom AG Formulators, Inc., signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/3/2023. (Marrujo, C)
|
March 14, 2023 |
Filing
239
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE re SETTLEMENT BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE BOONE FOR APRIL 27, 2023, AND CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MCAULIFFE UNTIL MAY 24, 2023. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/13/2023. (Kusamura, W)
|
February 13, 2023 |
Filing
235
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ALLOW FOR VIDEO APPEARANCES AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE UNDER CERTAIN PARAMETERS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/13/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to amend the settlement conference order, (ECF Nos. 232 , 233 ), is GRANTED, and the above-described counsel and insurance representative may appear remotely at the March 13, 2023 settlement conference, under the parameters outlined above in this order. (Gonzales, V)
|
January 17, 2023 |
Filing
228
ORDER SETTING in Person Settlement Conference and Settlement Instructions, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/17/2023. Settlement Conference set for 3/13/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Marrujo, C)
|
December 14, 2022 |
Filing
223
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request for Expert Fees and Denying the Request for Additional Attorney Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/14/2022. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 31, 2022 |
Filing
218
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 168 Motion for Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/31/2022. (Marrujo, C)
|
September 8, 2022 |
Filing
216
ORDER GRANTING 167 Plaintiff's Request to Seal Document in Accordance with Local Rule 141 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/07/2022.(Flores, E)
|
August 30, 2022 |
Filing
213
ORDER GRANTING 209 Plaintiff's Request to Seal Document in Accordance with Local Rule 141, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/30/2022. The Clerk shall file under seal the single-page document which is attached as Exhibit B to the Supplemental Declaration of John Miller in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. (Rivera, O)
|
August 19, 2022 |
Filing
208
ORDER GRANTING 206 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/19/2022. Added attorney Thomas Lee Dyer, PHV for Agrigenix, LLC,Thomas Lee Dyer, PHV for Agrigenix, LLC,Thomas Lee Dyer, PHV for Sean Mahoney. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Sant Agata, S)
|
August 16, 2022 |
Filing
204
ORDER GRANTING 202 Plaintiff Deerpoint Group, Inc's Motion for Administrative Relief for Leave to Exceed Page Limit in Reply Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/16/2022. (Marrujo, C)
|
July 26, 2022 |
Filing
199
ORDER GRANTING 198 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Donald Lake, PHV for Agrigenix, LLC and Sean Mahoney. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/26/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
|
June 22, 2022 |
Filing
189
ORDER GRANTING 175 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendants Agrigenix, LLC and Sean Mahoney, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/22/2022. Attorney George L. Hampton, IV and Charles K. Manock terminated. (Maldonado, C)
|
June 13, 2022 |
Filing
184
ORDER SETTING Telephonic Status Conference; ORDER DIRECTING Counsel Manock and Hampton to Serve This Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/13/2022. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Marrujo, C)
|
May 9, 2022 |
Filing
174
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/9/2022. Status Conference set for 6/6/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Sant Agata, S)
|
February 14, 2022 |
Filing
165
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/14/2022. (Rivera, O)
|
January 3, 2022 |
Filing
163
ORDER REGARDING CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/30/2021. (Gonzales, V)
|
November 9, 2021 |
Filing
162
ORDER on Stipulated Amended Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/9/2021. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/17/2022. (Jessen, A)
|
November 17, 2020 |
Filing
118
ORDER GRANTING 114 Withdrawal of Attorney; ORDER to DISREGARD Docket Entry 115 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/16/2020. (Rivera, O)
|
August 26, 2020 |
Filing
111
ORDER GRANTING 110 Stipulation to Amended Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/26/2020. Claim Construction Hearing set for 3/8/2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Rivera, O)
|
June 12, 2020 |
Filing
109
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER and vacating Pretrial and Trial Dates signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/11/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
|
March 11, 2020 |
Filing
89
ORDER EXTENDING Deadline to Answer Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/10/2020. Response due by 3/23/2020.(Marrujo, C)
|
February 24, 2020 |
Filing
80
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 68 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/24/2020. Status Conference set for 5/5/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Marrujo, C)
|
January 27, 2020 |
Filing
73
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 69 Request to Seal signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/27/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
|
September 5, 2019 |
Filing
65
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 50 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 09/05/2019. (Gonzales, V)
|
August 23, 2019 |
Filing
64
ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/22/2019. (Flores, E)
|
August 19, 2019 |
Filing
62
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Sanctions Should not be Imposed for Failure to Appear signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/16/2019. Show Cause Response due by 8/23/2019.(Flores, E)
|
August 7, 2019 |
Filing
58
STIPULATION and ORDER to Reschedule Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/7/2019. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and for good cause appearing, the Scheduling Conference currently set for August 13, 2 019, is HEREBY CONTINUED to August 16, 2019, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall meet and confer regarding proposed dates, with the exception of the deadline for exchange of initial disclosures which has expired, and file an updated Joint Scheduling Conference Report one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference. A copy shall additionally be emailed, in Word format, to bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. The parties are encouraged to appear at the scheduling conference telephonically and may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. (Valdez, E)
|
June 18, 2019 |
Filing
48
ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. No. 30 ) signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 06/17/2019. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED with respect to the fifth and seventh causes of action and those c laims are DISMISSED with leave to amend, consistent with this order. Defendants' motion to dismiss is otherwise DENIED. Within twenty-one days of service of this order, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint. Within fourteen days of service of the amended complaint, Defendants shall file an appropriate response. If Plaintiff fails to file a timely amended complaint, leave to amend shall automatically be withdrawn and Defendants shall file an answer within twenty-eight days of service of this order. (Gonzales, V)
|
January 31, 2019 |
Filing
33
Stipulated Protective ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/31/19. (Marrujo, C)
|
December 4, 2018 |
Filing
26
ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 10 . Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 10) is GRANTED as follows: The first and second causes of action against Mahoney are DISMISSED without leave to amend. The fifth and sixth causes of ac tion are DISMISSED with leave to amend. The eighth and ninth causes of action are DISMISSED with leave to amend to allege non-CUTSA based claims Defendants' motion to dismiss is otherwise DENIED. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, tha t is consistent with the analysis of this order, within twenty-one (21) days of service of this order. If Plaintiff files an amended complaint, Defendants shall file an answer or other appropriate response to the amended complaint within twenty-one (21) days of service of the amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file a timely amended complaint, then leave to amend shall automatically be withdrawn and, within twenty-one (21) of service of this order, Defendants shall file an answer to the Complaint in light of the analysis of this order. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/4/2018. (Timken, A)
|