Davis III v. Gibson et al

Plaintiff: Relmon H. Davis, III
Defendant: J. Vanderpool, Corcoran State Prison Trust Office, F Flores, J Kenner, Does, Dave Davey, K.A. Dicks, M Olivera and P. Sanchez
Case Number: 1:2018cv00610
Filed: May 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Defendant Olivera's 67 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT be granted signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/6/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R's due within 30-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING Defendant Olivera's 64 Motion for Summary Judgment, without Prejudice, for Failure to Provide RAND Notice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/25/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 59 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/24/19. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's January 24, 2019 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/7/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING 51 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and Denying 50 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/24/2019. (Flores, E)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's 50 Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/27/18. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT Inmate Relmon H. Davis, III, CDCR# F-24440 on January 18, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. at California State Prison-Corcoran, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/18/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING, Without Prejudice, Plaintiff's 45 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/6/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE and Staying Case for 90 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/19/2018. Settlement Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 08:30 AM at Corcoran State Prison before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. (Jessen, A)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DISCHARGING September 12, 2018 33 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/19/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Comply with a Court Order,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/12/2018. Show Cause Response due 14-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Adopting 29 Findings and Recommendations, Allowing Action to Proceed on Plaintiff's Due Process Claim Against Named Defendants, Dismissing All Other Claims and Defendants, and Referring Matter Back to Magistrate Judge for Initiation of S ervice of Process, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/1/18. Does (Staff escort moring meal, individual capacity), F Flores, J Kenner (Trust Officer, individual capacity), Corcoran State Prison Trust Office and Dave Davey (Warden, individual capacity) Terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending This Action Proceed on Plantiff's Due Process Claim Only Against Certain Named Defendants, and All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief 28 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis III v. Gibson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Relmon H. Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Vanderpool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corcoran State Prison Trust Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Kenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.A. Dicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Olivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?