Pizana v. Sanmedica International LLC
Plaintiff: Raul Pizana
Defendant: Sanmedica International LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00644
Filed: May 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE DEFENDANTS' REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS RELATED TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/17/2022. (Kusamura, W)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS' PAGE LIMITS FOR MOTION PRACTICE RELATED TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/18/2022. (Kusamura, W)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER GRANTING 240 Application for Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Carlos Nunez-Vivas, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/16/2022. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Rivera, O)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER REGARDING MOTION PRACTICE RELATED TO THE THIRD AMENDEDCOMPLAINT. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/12/2022. (Kusamura, W)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER GRANTING 233 Application for Pro Hac Vice, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 09/05/2022. Added Attorney Chad E. Nydegger, PHV for Limitless Worldwide, LLC. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Maldonado, C)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER GRANTING 209 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/04/2022. Added attorney Clancey S. Henderson, PHV for Mitchell K. Friedlander. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Flores, E)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING MOTION PRACTICE RELATED TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/22/2022. (Kusamura, W)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/31/2022. (Kusamura, W)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO QUASH AND VACATING HEARING. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/26/2022. (Kusamura, W)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 118 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/26/2022. ( Third Amended Complaint due within 21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: AMENDMENT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/18/2021. (Kusamura, W)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/18/2021. Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference set for 4/14/2021 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Kusamura, W)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Order on Defendant's 113 Motion to Partially Quash or Modify Subpoena to the Federal Trade Commission, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/29/2021. (Rosales, O.)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESUMPTION OF THE DEPOSITION OF SANMEDICA INTERNATIONAL 30(b)(6) (GINA DAINES). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/14/2021. (Kusamura, W)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING 119 Plaintiff's Unopposed Request to Seal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/4/2021. (Rivera, O)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 121 Defendant's Ex Parte Application and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 122 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/30/2020. Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend due by 1/15/2021. Plaintiff's Reply due by 1/22/2021. Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Amend is VACATED. (Jessen, A)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS; Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/23/2020. (Kusamura, W)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER DENYING 100 Request for Reconsideration of the Assigned Magistrate Judge's October 15, 2020 Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/23/2020. (Jessen, A)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/15/2020. (Kusamura, W)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION and ORDER RE: FRCP 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/20/2020. (Kusamura, W)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/10/2020. (Kusamura, W)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SCHEDULING ORDER; Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 5/5/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, Status Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/6/2020. (Kusamura, W)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS TO CHANGE VENUE AND STAY THIS ACTION (Doc. Nos. 57 , 59 ) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/29/2020. (Thorp, J)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (Docs. Nos. 8 , 25 , 30 , 37 ) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/30/2019. (Any amended complaint shall be filed within 30 days from the date of service of this order.)(Thorp, J)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting Defendant's 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint, Directing Clerk of the Court to File Proposed Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, and Setting Hearing on Motion to Dismiss the First A mended Complaint, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/24/2018. (1. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time to 7/23/2018 to respond to the first amended complaint; 2. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the proposed motion to dismiss the first amended complaint (Doc. No. 23-1, Ex. 1) on the docket captioned as the motion to dismiss the first amended complaint, which is deemed filed as of 7/23/2018; and 3. A hearing on the motion to dismiss the first amended complaint is set or 9/18/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.) (Gaumnitz, R)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to file amended complaint, 11 . Plaintiff's deadline to file an amended complaint pursuant to Rule 15(a)(1)(B) is EXTENDED until June 30, 2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/25/2018. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pizana v. Sanmedica International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Pizana
Represented By: Ryan Jack Clarkson
Represented By: Shireen M. Clarkson
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanmedica International LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Fitzgerald, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?