Knox v. Biter

Plaintiff: Willie H. Knox, III
Defendant: M. Biter
Case Number: 1:2018cv00761
Filed: June 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DISMISSING ACTION for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/12/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Vacating July 17, 2018 10 Findings and Recommendations; and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief re 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/22/18. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Gonzalez, R)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Objections to Pending Findings and Recommendations re 13 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/31/18. (Gonzalez, R)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign a District Judge to This Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Action be DISMISSED for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/17/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie H. Knox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?