Davis v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Markiel Davis
Defendant: State of California, Stuart Sherman, L. Koeppe and D. Roberts
Case Number: 1:2018cv00832
Filed: June 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING 43 Findings and Recommendations and dismissing action signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/11/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Action, With Prejudice, for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Obey Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/31/2020. Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN DAYS. (Marrujo, C)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute; Show Cause Response due within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/27/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING 37 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING Plaintiff's 35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/23/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Plaintiff's 35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction be Denied for Lack of Jurisdiction; Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/18/2019. Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN (14) Days. (Orozco, A)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING 31 Motion for Stamps and Envelopes signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/26/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER LIFTING STAY of Proceedings; ORDER VACATING October 8, 2019 Settlement Conference 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/8/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 120 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/9/19. CASE STAYED. (Gonzalez, R)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING 17 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants; This action is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for furtherproceedings consistent with this order,signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/23/2019. State of California (California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation), L. Koeppe (Supervising Registered Nurse, CSP-SATF) and Stuart Sherman (Warden at CSP-SATF) terminated. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing Clerk of Court to randomly assign District Judge to action; Case assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd. FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS regarding dismissal of certain claims and defendants 1 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/23/2019. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Markiel Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Koeppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?