Estate of Alejandro Sanchez et al v. County of Stanislaus et al
Plaintiff: Cristina Girardi, Estate of Alejandro Sanchez, Marina Sanchez, Irene Mamourieh and Bertha Sanchez
Defendant: Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department, Adam Christianson and County of Stanislaus
Case Number: 1:2018cv00977
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST for Filing of Oversized Opposition Brief to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Estate of Alejandro Sanchez, Cristina Girardi, Irene Mamourieh, Bertha Sanchez, Marina Sanchez. (Merin, Mark)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS by Adam Christianson, County of Stanislaus, Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of John R. Whitefleet)(Whitefleet, John)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the press of business, the Scheduling Conference is continued from 10/24/2018 to Wednesday, December 5, 2018 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. A JOINT Scheduling Conference Report, carefully prepared and executed by all counsel, shall be electronically filed in full compliance with the requirements set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference (Doc. #3 ), one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference, and a copy shall be e-mailed, in Word format, to bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Parties wishing to appear telephonically may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/29/2018. (Valdez, E)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Adam Christianson, County of Stanislaus, Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department. Attorney Whitefleet, John Robert added. (Whitefleet, John)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Adam Christianson served on 7/25/2018, answer due 8/15/2018. (Merin, Mark)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department served on 7/25/2018, answer due 8/15/2018. (Merin, Mark)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Stanislaus served on 7/24/2018, answer due 8/14/2018. (Merin, Mark)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Adam Christianson, County of Stanislaus, Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark E. Merin* *1010 F Street* *Suite 300* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Sant Agata, S)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adam Christianson, County of Stanislaus, Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department by Bertha Sanchez, Estate of Alejandro Sanchez, Irene Mamourieh, Marina Sanchez, Cristina Girardi. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7773056) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bertha Sanchez re Cal. Code Civ. Proc. 377.32, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merin, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Alejandro Sanchez et al v. County of Stanislaus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Girardi
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Alejandro Sanchez
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Sanchez
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Mamourieh
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Sanchez
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Christianson
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Stanislaus
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?