(PC) Peralta v. Swetalla et al
Plaintiff: Cion Peralta
Defendant: L. Machado, J. Sebok, J. Swetalla, V. Powers and Xavier Cano
Case Number: 1:2018cv01023
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Cion Peralta. (Jessen, A)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT Plaintiff's Consent or Decline Due Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/17/18. (Gonzalez, R)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Cion Peralta. (Gonzalez, R)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Gonzalez, R)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Cion Peralta. (Gonzalez, R)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE100039835 $400.00 fbo Cion Peralta, P-33314 by David Siemienski on 7/30/2018. (Gonzalez, R)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Xavier Cano, L. Machado, V. Powers, J. Sebok, J. Swetalla by Cion Peralta.(Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Peralta v. Swetalla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cion Peralta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Machado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Sebok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Swetalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?