(PC) Villery v. Sanders et al
Plaintiff: Jared M. Villery
Defendant: William Gibbons, Travis Alatorre, B. Sanders, Luis Machado and Edgar Coontz
Case Number: 1:2018cv01067
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 1:18-cv-01067 DAD JDP (PC). (Hellings, J)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jared M. Villery. (Hellings, J)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Jared M. Villery. (Hellings, J)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Sant Agata, S)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: New Case Documents served on Valley State Prison. (Sant Agata, S)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *8/9/2018*; Consent or Decline due by 9/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Sant Agata, S)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Jared M. Villery. (Sant Agata, S)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jared M. Villery. (Sant Agata, S)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jared M. Villery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Villery v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Alatorre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Machado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Coontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared M. Villery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?