New York Life Insurance Company v. Orona et al
Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Sherman L. McNew, Phyllis J. Taro, Margaret L. Orona and Heather L. Trammel
Case Number: 1:2018cv01143
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 14 Minute Order, served on Phyllis J. Taro and Heather L. Trammel. (Valdez, E)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT Only) Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference currently set for Tuesday, November 27, 2018 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/17/2018. (Valdez, E)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Heather L. Trammel. (Sant Agata, S)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER by Heather L. Trammel.(Sant Agata, S)
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Heather L. Trammel Waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Walker, John)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Phyllis J. Taro. (Gonzalez, R)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Sherman L. McNew Waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Walker, John)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Phyllis J. Taro Waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Walker, John)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Margaret L. Orona Waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Walker, John)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER by Phyllis J. Taro. (Gonzalez, R)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff New York Life Insurance Company. (Walker, John)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Gonzalez, R)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Sherman L. McNew, Margaret L. Orona, Phyllis J. Taro, Heather L. Trammel* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Walker* *Sacro & Walker LLP* *701 N. Brand Blvd., Suite 800* *Glendale, CA 91203*. (Gonzalez, R)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by New York Life Insurance Company (Walker, John)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by New York Life Insurance Company. Attorney Walker, John added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7829171) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application dated February 9, 1998, #2 Exhibit B - Insured's Certificate of Death, #3 Exhibit C - Death Benefit Proceeds Form dated February 5, 2018, #4 Exhibit D - Letter Dated February 6, 2018)(Walker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Life Insurance Company v. Orona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman L. McNew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis J. Taro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret L. Orona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather L. Trammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John Walker
Represented By: Jennifer Yu Sacro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?