Rosales et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: George Rosales and Patricia Rosales
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Haberfelde Ford
Case Number: 1:2018cv01165
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 OTHER COURT CASE NUMBER from CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA case number 2:18-cv-08394. (Robles, S)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-18). CASE TRANSFERRED to the Central District of California. MDL No. 2814.(Robles, S)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:18-ml-2814 by Ford Motor Company, Haberfelde Ford. (LaCour, Marcia)
August 28, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Civil New Case Documents for LJO, #5 Clerk's Notice served on Marcia M. LaCour NCAED, Charles J. Lee NCAED, Christopher M. Lovasz NCAED. (Jessen, A)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE DIRECTING Attorneys Charles J. Lee, Christopher M. Lovasz and Marcia M. LaCour to submit Petition for Admission to Practice in the Eastern District of California. (Jessen, A)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
August 28, 2018 RECEIPT number #CAE100040094 $400.00 fbo Ford Motor Company by Eddings Attorney Services on 8/28/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: Attn: Phung, Angie ***New Civil Case Filing Fee Required****Advance payment of the filing fee in the amount of $400.00 is required and should be submitted electronically using the event Payment of Fees. Your case will not be filed until the fee is paid (Local Rule 121c). If you wish to pay with cash, check or money order, the fee must be received by the clerk's office within 48 hours of lodging your complaint, or your documents will be deleted from the court's server. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website.(Martin-Gill, S)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ford Motor Company, Haberfelde Ford (Phung, Angie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number Bcv-18-101520 SDS by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Interested Parties, #2 Declaration of Marcia LaCour)(Phung, Angie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosales et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Rosales
Represented By: Christopher M. Lovasz, NCAED
Represented By: Charles J. Lee, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Rosales
Represented By: Christopher M. Lovasz, NCAED
Represented By: Charles J. Lee, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Marcia M. LaCour
Represented By: Angie Van-Anh Phung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haberfelde Ford
Represented By: Marcia M. LaCour
Represented By: Angie Van-Anh Phung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?