(PC) Bealer v. Kern Valley State Prison
Case Number: 1:2018cv01170
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Vacating 12 Findings and Recommendations Issued on December 12, 2018, and Granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/19/19. (Gonzalez, R)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Request for a Copy of the Court's Last Order, and Directing the Clerk of Court to Serve Plaintiff a Copy of the Findings and Recommendations Issued on December 12, 2018 13 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/28/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis 11 be Denied; Plaintiff be required to pay the $400.00 filing fee within thirty (30) days of service of the Court's order adopting these findings and recommendations re 11 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Antwoine Bealer ; referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/11/2018. Objections to F&R due (30-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign a Fresno District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Action for Failure to Prosecute, and Failure to Pay Filing Fee, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/13/18. This Case is Assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The New Case No. is: 1:18-cv-01170-DAD-SAB. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Clarification, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/2/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bealer v. Kern Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?