(PC) Jeys v. Batra
Plaintiff: Carthell David Jeys
Defendant: S. Batra
Case Number: 1:2018cv01212
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Carthell David Jeys. (Sant Agata, S)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Proceed IFP as a Non- Prisoner signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/21/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Carthell David Jeys. (Sant Agata, S)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Carthell David Jeys. (Sant Agata, S)
September 11, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Carthell David Jeys. (Sant Agata, S)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SUBMIT a NON-PRISONER Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or PAY the $400.00 Filing Fee; Thirty (30) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Non-Prisoner IFP Application)(Sant Agata, S)
September 10, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Carthell David Jeys. (Sant Agata, S)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against S. Batra by Carthell David Jeys.(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Jeys v. Batra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carthell David Jeys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Batra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?