Cortes v. MTC Financial, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Martin J Cortes
Defendant: MTC Financial, Inc. dba Trustee Corps, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, MTC Financial Inc. and MTC Financial Inc. Doing business as Trustee Corps
Case Number: 1:2018cv01269
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 11/6/2018. #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney argued, submitted and Denied without prejudice for reasons stated on the record. Plaintiff's Counsel Mohammad Maaz telephonically present. Defendants' Counsel Justin Fong telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven. (Thorp, J)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: (TIME CHANGE ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/1/2018; the #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney on calendar 11/6/2018, WILL BE HEARD at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The parties are encouraged to appear telephonically and may do so by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236) at the time of the hearing. Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. Use of any feature(s) that may have an impact upon the quality of voice transmission (such as speakerphones, headsets, etc.) are prohibited; use of a land line or hand-held cell phone is required. At least 24 hours prior to the hearing, if you have not already done so, you must email Courtroom Deputy Jami Thorp, at JThorp@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court you will be appearing telephonically. (Thorp, J)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Delgadillo, Bryant)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY by Martin J Cortes. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Attorney's Dec ISO Motion to be Relieved as Counsel, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion to be Relieved as Counsel, #3 Cert of Service re Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)(Maaz, Mohammad)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 28 DAYS by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Delgadillo, Bryant)
September 17, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Civil New Case Documents for DAD served on Bryant S. Delgadillo. (Lundstrom, T)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
September 17, 2018 RECEIPT number 0972-7870598 for $400.00 fbo JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association from Bryant S. Delgadillo. (Flores, E)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. (Delgadillo, Bryant)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Delgadillo, Bryant)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in re #1 Notice of Removal. (Delgadillo, Bryant)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL by Martin J Cortes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Delgadillo, Bryant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortes v. MTC Financial, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial, Inc. dba Trustee Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Bryant S. Delgadillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc. Doing business as Trustee Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J Cortes
Represented By: Mohammad Oussama Maaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?