(SS) Tuupoina v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David Tuupoina
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv01320
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Naicker, Tina added. (Naicker, Tina)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS: 6 Summons, 1 USM-285 Forms, and 5 copies of the complaint, by David Tuupoina. (Sant Agata, S)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 1/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 FRS SS Scheduing Order, #2 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Kelsey Mackenzie Brown* *Mackenzie Legal, PLLC* *1003 Whitman Street* *Tacoma, WA 98406*. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Proceed IFP; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk issue summons and the United States marshal serve a copy of the complaint, summons and this order upon the defendant(s) as directed by the plaintiff. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/1/18. (Attachments: #1 USM Social Security Instructions) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 26, 2018 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Jessen, A)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by David Tuupoina. (Brown, Kelsey)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by David Tuupoina (Brown, Kelsey)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by David Tuupoina. Attorney Brown, Kelsey Mackenzie added.(Brown, Kelsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Tuupoina v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tuupoina
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?