Angel Leon v. International Paper Company, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Angel Leon
Defendant: Vince Wilson, International Paper Company Inc., Graphic Packaging International, LLC and International Paper Company Inc. a New York Corporation Doing business as International Paper also known as Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01323
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER by Graphic Packaging International, LLC. Attorney Watkins, Miranda R. added.(Watkins, Miranda)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare County Superior Court, case number VCU272575 by Angel Leon. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7887319) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of E. Jewelle Johnson, #3 Declaration of Miranda R. Watkins, #4 Notice of Party with Financial Interest, #5 Notice of Interested Parties)(Watkins, Miranda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angel Leon v. International Paper Company, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vince Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company Inc.
Represented By: Miranda R. Watkins
Represented By: Danielle Hultenius Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Represented By: Miranda R. Watkins
Represented By: Danielle Hultenius Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company Inc. a New York Corporation Doing business as International Paper also known as Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Represented By: Miranda R. Watkins
Represented By: Danielle Hultenius Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Leon
Represented By: Ramin R. Younessi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?