(PC) Greene v. Ortiz et al

Plaintiff: Rashan Greene
Defendant: M. Ortiz, J. Acevedo, S. Sevilla and M. Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2018cv01330
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order Vacating Findings and Recommendations served on Rashan Greene. (Jessen, A)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER VACATING #11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER GRANTING #12 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/20/2018. Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for 14-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to Prepare Amended Complaint by Rashan Greene. (Marrujo, C)
November 19, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Rashan Greene. (Marrujo, C)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 *VACATED PER ORDER #13 * FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief and Failure to Comply With a Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/19/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
November 2, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Rashan Greene. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:18-cv-1330 DAD-SAB (PC). (Martin-Gill, S)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Rashan Greene. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 9, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Screening Order served on Rashan Greene. (Gonzalez, R)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/8/18. Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Gonzalez, R)
October 2, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Rashan Greene. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/2/18. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFIED PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Rashan Greene. (Jessen, A)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Rashan Greene, CDC F-33639 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Jessen, A)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 DOCUMENTS SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Corcoran State Prison. (Jessen, A)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *9/26/2018*; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Jessen, A)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Rashan Greene. (Jessen, A)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Acevedo, M. Ortiz, M. Rodriguez, S. Sevilla by Rashan Greene. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Greene v. Ortiz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Sevilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashan Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?