(PC)Garcia v. California State Superior Courts et al

Plaintiff: Paul Carlos Garcia, Rocky Devon Froemel and Terrence Davis
Defendant: California State Attorney General, California Department of Corrections, California State Superior Courts and California Parole Hearing Board
Case Number: 1:2018cv01369
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Dismissing Case served on Paul Carlos Garcia. (Hellings, J)
November 21, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER CLOSING the Case Due to Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice #9 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/20/2018: The Clerk is ordered to close this case. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
November 15, 2018 9 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Paul Carlos Garcia. (Gonzalez, R)
October 30, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order to Show Cause served on Paul Carlos Garcia. (Sant Agata, S)
October 30, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why this Action Should not be Dismissed without Prejudice for Failing to Exhaust his Administrative Remedies; Show Cause Response due within 21 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/29/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 30, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Paul Carlos Garcia. (Hellings, J)
October 30, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP #2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 Trust Account Statement) (Hellings, J)
October 11, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Paul Carlos Garcia. (Sant Agata, S)
October 11, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER SEVERING Plaintiff's Claims and DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Open New Actions for Plaintiffs Froemel and Davis signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/10/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 9, 2018 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Paul Carlos Garcia. (Flores, E)
October 9, 2018 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *10/4/2018*; Consent or Decline due by 11/13/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 9, 2018 3 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Paul Carlos Garcia, CDC V-67921 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 4, 2018 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Paul Carlos Garcia. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 4, 2018 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against California Department of Corrections, California Parole Hearing Board, California State Attorney General, California State Superior Courts by Paul Carlos Garcia, Terrence Davis, Rocky Devon Froemel.(Martin-Gill, S) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Martin-Gill, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Garcia v. California State Superior Courts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Superior Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Parole Hearing Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Carlos Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Devon Froemel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?