(PC)Davis v. California State Superior Courts et al

Plaintiff: Terrence Davis
Defendant: California Department of Corrections, California State Superior Courts, California State Attorney General and California Parole Hearing Board
Case Number: 1:2018cv01397
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
0 Judge: Dale A Drozd
1 Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Terrence Davis. (Hellings, J)
December 3, 2018 9 Featured Case FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust and to Comply With the Court's Order and Failure to Prosecute This Action #5 , #8 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/3/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
October 30, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order to Show Cause served on Terrence Davis. (Hellings, J)
October 30, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed Without Prejudice for Failing to Exhaust Administrative Remedies #1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/29/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
October 29, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Terrence Davis. (Hellings, J)
October 29, 2018 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:18-cv-01397 DAD JLT (PC). (Hellings, J)
October 29, 2018 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Terrence Davis. (Hellings, J)
October 15, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, served on Terrence Davis. (Marrujo, C)
October 15, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/15/18. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion)(Marrujo, C)
October 11, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #3 Order, #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint served on Terrence Davis. (Sant Agata, S)
October 11, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER SEVERING Plaintiffs' Claims and DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Open New Actions for Plaintiffs Froemel and Davis signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/10/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 11, 2018 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
October 11, 2018 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Terrence Davis.(Sant Agata, S)
October 10, 2018 4 NOTICE RE E-Filing by Terrence Davis. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Davis v. California State Superior Courts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Superior Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Parole Hearing Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?