(DP) Letner v. Davis

Petitioner: Richard Lacy Letner
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Case Number: 1:2018cv01459
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
2 Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AMENDED INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference is set for 1/9/2019 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/11/2018. (Hernandez, M)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING Initial Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 SEALED EVENT. (Sant Agata, S)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPOINTING Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/2/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to RELATE Actions, to REASSIGN Judges signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/30/2018. New Case Number: 1:18-cv-01459-LJO-SAB. (Sant Agata, S)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Galen Neale Farris on behalf of Ronald Davis. Attorney Farris, Galen Neale added. (Farris, Galen)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ASSIGNING Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone to This Action, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/25/18. (Marrujo, C)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Appointment of Counsel; ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/25/18. (Marrujo, C)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Richard Lacy Letner. (Flores, E)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Richard Lacy Letner, CDC E-54003 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Flores, E)
October 23, 2018 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Flores, E)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Death Penalty Case. (Flores, E)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Richard Lacy Letner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Culshaw, Kelly)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel by Richard Lacy Letner. Attorney Culshaw, Kelly L. added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Lacy Letner, Jr.)(Culshaw, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (DP) Letner v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Represented By: Kenneth Norman Sokoler
Represented By: Galen Neale Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Lacy Letner
Represented By: Kelly L. Culshaw
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Corey Mann
Represented By: Lisa R Short
Represented By: Michael R. Snedeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?