Patino, et al. v. County of Merced, et al.
Plaintiff: Elenor Skye Villanueva Patino and Lillyanna Amelia Patino
Defendant: County of Merced, Vernon Warnke, Greg Sullivan, Corey Gibson and Aaron Rosenburg
Case Number: 1:2018cv01468
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by County of Merced, Corey Gibson, Aaron Rosenburg, Greg Sullivan, Vernon Warnke. (Varanini, Jerome)
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER with Jury Demand by County of Merced, Corey Gibson, Aaron Rosenburg, Greg Sullivan, Vernon Warnke. Attorney Varanini, Jerome Martin added.(Varanini, Jerome)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Merced served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Schwartz, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Vernon Warnke served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Schwartz, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Greg Sullivan served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Schwartz, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Aaron Rosenburg served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Schwartz, Robert)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Corey Gibson served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Schwartz, Robert)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Lillyanna Villanueva #6 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/5/2018: Adrianna Lucas Andrade is appointed as Guardian Ad Litem for Lillyanna Amelia Patino, her minor daughter. (Hellings, J)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Elenor Skye Villanueva Pation #5 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/5/2018: Julia Villanueva is appointed as Guardian Ad Litem for Elenor Skye Villanueva Patino, her minor daughter. (Hellings, J)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM of Lillyanna Ameila Patino by Lillyanna Amelia Patino. (Schwartz, Robert)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM of MINOR ELENOR SKYE VILLANUEVA PATINO by Elenor Skye Villanueva Patino. (Schwartz, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM. Within ten days from the date of entry of this order, Plaintiffs' counsel shall file evidence that the representative has been appointed under state law or a motion for appointment of a guardian ad litem that meets the requirements of Rule 202. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/26/2018. (Timken, A)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Hellings, J)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Merced, Corey Gibson, Aaron Rosenburg, Greg Sullivan, Vernon Warnke* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert John Schwartz* *Gwilliam Ivary Chiosso Cavalli and Brewer* *1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1600* *Oakland, CA 94612-3528*. (Hellings, J)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Plaintiffs by elenor skye villanueva patino, lillyanna amelia patino. Attorney Schwartz, Robert John added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7934628) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwartz, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patino, et al. v. County of Merced, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Merced
Represented By: Jerome Martin Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Warnke
Represented By: Jerome Martin Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Sullivan
Represented By: Jerome Martin Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Gibson
Represented By: Jerome Martin Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Rosenburg
Represented By: Jerome Martin Varanini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elenor Skye Villanueva Patino
Represented By: J Gary Gwilliam
Represented By: Robert John Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillyanna Amelia Patino
Represented By: J Gary Gwilliam
Represented By: Robert John Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?